Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9589
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9589
Title:Kenneth L. Harris, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17552)
   Decision Date:November 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 28, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Aug 27 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Brooks Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Andrew B. Greenlee, P.A.
401 E 1st Street. Unit 261
Sanford, FL 32772

andrew@andrewgreenleelaw.com
407-808-6411
Party name: Kenneth Harris
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543