Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Curtis Giovanni Flowers, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1205
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2010-DP-01348-SCT)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2018 to July 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 02 2018Application (17A1205) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 22, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Magnolia Bar Association, Mississippi Center for Justice, and Innocence Project New Orleans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2018 to September 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 26, 2018.
Sep 27 2018Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Reply of petitioner Curtis Flowers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 02 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Mississippi Supreme Court erred in how it applied Batson v. Kentucky, 476 U. S. 79 (1986), in this case.
Nov 20 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2018.
Dec 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2018Joint appendix filed (2 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 27 2018Brief of petitioner Curtis Flowers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Justice Department Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Motion of respondent for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits is granted to and including February 7, 2019.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 20, 2019
Feb 07 2019Brief of respondent State of Mississippi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 26 2019Record received from the Supreme Court of Mississippi is electronic and complete.
Mar 07 2019Reply of petitioner Curtis Flowers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2019Argued. For petitioner: Sheri Lynn Johnson, Ithaca, N. Y. For respondent: Jason Davis, Special Assistant Attorney General, Jackson, Miss.
Jun 21 2019Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a concurring opinion. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Gorsuch, J., joined as to Parts I, II, and III.
Jul 23 2019MANDATE ISSUED.
Jul 23 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sheri Lynn Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
245 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

slj8@cornell.edu
607 255 6478
Party name: Curtis Flowers
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Lewis Davis
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General
P.O.Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205

jdavi@ago.state.ms.us
601-359-3680
Party name: State of Mississippi
Brad Alan SmithThe Office of the Mississippi Attorney General
P. O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

bsmit@ago.state.ms.us
769-220-2009
Party name: Mississippi
Other
James William Craig
    Counsel of Record
The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
4400 S. Carrollton Ave.
New Orleans, LA 70119

jim.craig@macarthurjustice.org
504-620-2259
Party name: Magnolia Bar Association, Mississippi Center for Justice, and Innocence Project New Orleans
Christopher Eberhart Kemmitt
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th St. NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

ckemmitt@naacpldf.org
2026821300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Former Justice Department Officials

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543