Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9560
Title:Hamid Mohamed Ahmed Ali Rehaif, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15860-AA)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jul 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 24 2018Response Requested. (Due August 23, 2018)
Aug 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018.
Oct 24 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 07 2018Reply of petitioner Hamid Rehaif filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Godfrey
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
201 South Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

robert_godfrey@fd.org
407-648-6338
Party name: Hamid Rehaif
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543