Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9556 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9556 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Lenard James Philmore, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1036
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-711)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2018Application (17A1036) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2018 to June 24, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Application (17A1036) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 24, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Aug 06 2018Reply of petitioner Lenard Philmore filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Rescheduled.
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ali Andrew Shakoor
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33677

shakoor@ccmr.state.fl.us
813-558-1600
Party name: Lenard Philmore
Attorneys for Respondent
Leslie Teresa Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 North Flagler Drive, Suite 900
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Leslie.Campbell@myfloridalegal.com
561-268-5201
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543