Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9490
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9490
Title:Paul Lewis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13657)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2018 to August 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2018.
Aug 22 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 06 2018Reply of petitioner Paul Lewis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 W. Flagler St.
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

andrew_adler@fd.org
305-536-6900
Party name: Paul Lewis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543