Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-949
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-949
Title:John Sturgeon, Petitioner
v.
Bert Frost, in His Official Capacity as Alaska Regional Director of the National Park Service, et al.
Docketed:January 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-36165)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Alaska filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Amicus brief of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation not accepted for filing. (February 09, 2018)
Feb 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2018 to March 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2018.
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2018 to April 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 6, 2018.
Apr 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018
May 07 2018Brief of respondents Bert Frost, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 21 2018Reply of petitioner John Sturgeon filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 18 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 7, 2018. The time to file respondents brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2018.
Aug 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John Sturgeon
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner John Sturgeon.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 07 2018Brief of petitioner John Sturgeon filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Alaska filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Safari Club International filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Ahtna, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation and Central New York Fair Business Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 5, 2018
Sep 06 2018Motion of State of Alaska for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 11 2018Brief of respondents Bert Frost, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of National Parks Conservation Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Alaska Native Subsistence Users filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 19 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. District of Alaska is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of 1 envelope of Clerk's Files.
Oct 01 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 09 2018Motion of State of Alaska for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 11 2018Reply of petitioner John Sturgeon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2018Argued. For petitioner: Matthew T. Findley, Anchorage, Alaska; and Ruth Botstein, Assistant Attorney General, Anchorage, Alaska (for Alaska, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Todd Findley
    Counsel of Record
Ashburn & Mason, P.C.
1227 W. Ninth Avenue, Suite 200
Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

matt@anchorlaw.com
(907)-276-4331
Party name: John Sturgeon
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Bert Frost, et al.
Other
Ruth Botstein
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Office of the Attorney General
1031 W. 4th Ave.
Anchorage, AK 99501

ruth.botstein@alaska.gov
907-269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska
James J Devine Jr.
    Counsel of Record
128 Main Street
Oneida, NY 13421

jdevine@centralny.twcbc.com
315-363-6600
Party name: Citizens Equal Rights Foundation
Anthony Lee Francois
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

alf@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Jonathan William Katchen
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
1029 W.Third Avenue Suite 550
Anchorage, AK 99501

jwkatchen@hollandhart.com
907-865-2600
Party name: Ahtna, Inc.
Justin R. Pidot
    Counsel of Record
University of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 East Evans Ave
Denver, CO 80208

justin.pidot@gmail.com
3038716168
Party name: Law Professors
Anna M. Seidman
    Counsel of Record
Safari Club International
501 2nd Street NE
Washington, DC 20002

aseidman@safariclub.org
202-543-8733
Party name: Safari Club International
Steven W. Strack
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

steve.strack@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4143
Party name: States of Arizona, et al.
Robert T. Anderson
    Counsel of Record
University of Washington
Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

boba@uw.edu
2066852861
Party name: Alaska Native Subsistence Users
Valerie Lynn Brown
    Counsel of Record
Trustees for Alaska
1026 W. 4th Avenue
Anchorage, AK 99501-1980

vbrown@trustees.org
9074332014
Party name: National Parks Conservation Association, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society, American Rivers, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Wilderness Watch, Denali Citizens Council, Copper Country Alliance, Alaska Quiet Rights Coalition, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Alaska Wilderness League

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543