Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9469
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9469
Title:Phillip Angel Garcia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2019)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 19, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2018 to August 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 20, 2018.
Aug 20 2018Memorandum in opposition of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mallory Margaret Gagan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
111 Lomas Blvd NW, Suite 501
Albuquerque, NM 87102

mallory_gagan@fd.org
5053462489
Party name: Phillip Angel Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543