Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-945
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-945
Title:Kevin Quinn, et al., Petitioners
v.
Board of County Commissioners for Queen Anne's County, Maryland, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2018
Linked with 17A421
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1890)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2017Application (17A421) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 2, 2017, 2017 to December 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 18 2017Application (17A421) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 29, 2017.
Dec 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2018Waiver of right of respondent Maryland Department of the Environment, Robert M. Summers, PhD to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 19, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Gerald Sommer
    Counsel of Record
Gallagher Evelius & Jones LLP
218 North Charles Street
Suite 400
Baltimore, MD 21201

dsommer@gejlaw.com
410-951-1414
Party name: Kevin Quinn, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mitchell Y. Mirviss
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
750 East Pratt Street, Suite 900
Baltimore, MD 21202

mymirviss@venable.com
(410) 244-7400
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Queen Anne's County, Maryland, et al.
Adam D. Snyder
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

asnyder@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-6398
Party name: Maryland Department of the Environment, Robert M. Summers, PhD

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543