Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9400
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9400
Title:Terrance Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7190)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2018.
Aug 15 2018Memorandum in opposition of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Terrance Smith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018 received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frances Hemsley Pratt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314

Fran_Pratt@fd.org
703-600-0815
Party name: Terrance Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543