Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9399
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9399
Title:Ernest D. Shields, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1929)
   Decision Date:March 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Jul 16 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Stokeling v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2019).
Mar 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John T. Kennedy
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John T. Kennedy
820 Davis Street, Suite 434
Evanston, IL 60201

kennedy3317@aol.com
847-425-1115
Party name: Ernest D. Shields
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543