Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9379
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9379
Title:Charles Chubb, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 14, 2018
Linked with 17A1059
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3352)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2018Application (17A1059) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 8, 2018 to June 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Application (17A1059) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 7, 2018.
Jun 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2018.
Aug 15 2018Memorandum in opposition of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 29 2018Reply of petitioner Charles Chubb filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018, received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zenaida R. Lockard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office Southern District of Ohio
250 East Fifth Street
Suite 350
Cincinnati, OH 45202

Zenaida_Lockard@fd.org
513-929-4834
Party name: Charles Chubb
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543