Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9378
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9378
Title:Daryl Diemer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3403)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountOtherCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office
818 Grand, Suite 300
Kansas City, MO 64106

dan_goldberg@fd.org
8164718282
Party name: Daryl Diemer
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543