Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-936
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-936
Title:Gilead Sciences, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Jeffrey Campie, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-16380)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gilead Sciences, Inc..
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543