Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9353
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9353
Title:Willie Walker, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13448)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jul 13 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bonnie Williams
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

Bonnie_Phillips-Williams@fd.org
305-533-4282
Party name: Willie Walker
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543