Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9340
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9340
Title:Randy Joe Metcalf, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4006)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2018.
Jul 16 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Gail Heriot, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Equal Opportunity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 14, 2018.
Sep 14 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Gail Heriot, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Rae Quick
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office for the Northern and Southern Districts of Iowa
222 Third Avenue SE
Suite 290
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

heather_quick@fd.org
319-363-9540
Party name: Randy Metcalf
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Peter Nicholas Kirsanow
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP
200 Public Square, Suite 2300
Cleveland, OH 44114-2378

pkirsanow@beneschlaw.com
216-363-4500
Party name: Amici Curiae Gail Heriot and Peter Kirsanow
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
678-347-2200
Party name: Center for Equal Opportunity

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543