Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9276
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9276
Title:Thilo Brown, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-7056)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 9, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 08 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Thilo Brown filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 9, 2018 to August 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 8, 2018
Aug 08 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 20 2018Reply of petitioner Thilo Brown filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 04 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Thilo Brown filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018 received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Sep 18 2018Supplemental Brief of Thilo Brown not accepted for filing. (September 19, 2018) (Corrected supplemental brief to be filed)
Sep 19 2018Third supplemental brief of petitioner Thilo Brown filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alicia Vachira Penn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
145 King Street
Charleston, SC 29401

alicia_penn@fd.org
8437274148
Party name: Thilo Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543