Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-921
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-921
Title:Safety National Casualty Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Los Angeles Unified School District
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B275597)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 11, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert L. Byer
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
600 Grant ST
Suite 5010
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORPORATION
Attorneys for Respondent
David W. Steuber
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 S. Flower St, 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

dsteuber@jonesday.com
213-489-3939
Party name: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543