Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9151
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9151
Title:Burnett Godbee, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 31, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17211)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2018.
Aug 01 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Orlando do Campo
    Counsel of Record
do Campo & Thorton, PA
100 SE 2nd Street
Suite 2700
Miami, FL 33131

od@dandtlaw.com
3053586600
Party name: Burnett Godbee
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543