Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-915
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-915
Title:North Coast Railroad Authority, Petitioner
v.
Friends of the Eel River, et al.
Docketed:December 28, 2017
Linked with 17A373
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S222472)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2017Application (17A373) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 25, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Oct 05 2017Application (17A373) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 22, 2017.
Dec 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018Waiver of right of respondent Friends of the Eel River to respond filed.
Jan 26 2018Waiver of right of respondent Californians for Alternatives to Toxics to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 21 2018Response Requested. (Due March 23, 2018)
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondents Friends of the Eel River, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioner North Coast Railroad Authority filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Tauber
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

atauber@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3324
Party name: North Coast Railroad Authority
Attorneys for Respondents
Amy J. Bricker
    Counsel of Record
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger, LLP
396 Hayes Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

415-552-7272
Party name: Friends of the Eel River
Sharon Eileen Duggan
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Sharon E. Duggan
336 Adeline Street
Oakland, CA 94607

sharon@sharonduggan.org
510-271-0825
Party name: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Deborah A. Sivas
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Enviromental Law Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

dsivas@stanford.edu
650-723-0325
Party name: Friends of the Eel River, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543