Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9128
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9128
Title:Keenan Joyner, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 30, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17285)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 29, 2018)
Petition
Jun 29 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tracy M. Dreispul
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Southern District of FL
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

Tracy_Dreispul@fd.org
305-536-6900
Party name: Keenan Joyner
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543