Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9097
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9097
Title:Jaumon R. Lewis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 25, 2018
Linked with 17A1090
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11494)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2018Application (17A1090) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Application (17A1090) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 23, 2018.
May 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Jun 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Aug 24 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Yvonne Foldes
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 E. Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

margaret_foldes@fd.org
9543567436
Party name: Jaumon Lewis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543