Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9045
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9045
Title:Robert Homrich, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 24, 2018
Linked with 17A951
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1612)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2018Application (17A951) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 8, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 08 2018Application (17A951) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 7, 2018.
May 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 13 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated June 13, 2018 received withdrawing respondent's waiver of the right to file a response in this case and requesting to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018.
Main Document
Jun 15 2018Order extending the time to file a response to the petition to and including July 25, 2018.
Jun 15 2018Rescheduled.
Jul 25 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018 received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Ann LaCosse
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
925 W. Washington Street
Ste. 104
Marquette, MI 49855

Beth_LaCosse@fd.org
906-226-3050
Party name: Robert Homrich
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543