Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-897
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-897
Vide 17-807
Title:Keith Mandan, Petitioner
v.
Sonny Perdue, Secretary of Agriculture, et al.
Docketed:December 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5189, 16-5190)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondents Porter Holder and Claryca Mandan in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 06 2018Reply of petitioner Keith Mandan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William A. Sherman II
    Counsel of Record
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
801 Pennsylvania Ave, N.W.
Suite 610
Washington, DC 20004

william.sherman@dinsmore.com
202-372-9117
Party name: Keith Mandan
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent
Joseph Marc Sellers
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC
1100 New York Ave., N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jsellers@cohenmilstein.com
202-408-4600
Party name: Porter Holder and Claryca Mandan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543