Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8951
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8951
Title:Cefalo Lewis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11066)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 15, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2018 to July 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 16, 2018.
Jul 16 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cefalo Lewis09574-104
P.O. Box 699
Estill, SC 29918

Party name: Cefalo Lewis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543