Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8860
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8860
Title:Issac Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10680)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 11, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherPetitionOther
Jun 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2018 to July 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 11, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Holt
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office
150 West Flagler Street, Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33130

julie_holt@fd.org
3055307000
Party name: Issac Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543