Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-88
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-88
Title:Wayside Church, et al., Petitioners
v.
Van Buren County, Michigan, et al.
Docketed:July 17, 2017
Linked with 16A1068
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2463, 15-2525)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Application (16A1068) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to July 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 03 2017Application (16A1068) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 13, 2017.
Jul 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2017)
Jul 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 25 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Van Buren County, MI, et al. on 08/16/2017
Aug 01 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation Litigation filed.
Aug 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions filed.
Sep 15 2017Brief of respondents Van Buren County, MI, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 28 2017Reply of petitioners Wayside Church, et al. filed.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christina Marie Martin
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
8645 N. Military Trail, Suite 511
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

cmm@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Wayside Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas George King
    Counsel of Record
Kreis Enderle Hudgins & Borsos, PC
8225 Moorsbridge
Portage, MI 49024

269 324 3000
Party name: Van Buren County, MI, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird, LLP
1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
916-498-3354
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Julie Nepveu
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E. Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

jnepveu@aarp.org
(202)-434-2075
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation Litigation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis, LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
202-314-2048
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543