Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8775
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8775
Title:Jason Greer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1282)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 4, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
May 22 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 05 2018Response Requested. (Due July 5, 2018)
Jun 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 15 2018Reply of petitioner Jason Greer filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 04 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Jason Greer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018 received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting). Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Josh Lee
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
633 17th Street
Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

josh.lee@fd.org
303-294-7002
Party name: Jason Greer
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543