Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8766
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8766
Title:Edwin DeShazior, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11737)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
May 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2018 to July 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2018.
Jul 05 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 11 2018Reply of petitioner Edwin DeShazior filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 W. Flagler St.
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

andrew_adler@fd.org
305-533-5900
Party name: Edwin DeShazior
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543