Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8745
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8745
Title:Trevor Williams, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2674, 15-3503)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 1, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2018.
Jul 02 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Habib
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.
52 Duane Street
10th Floor
New York, NY 10007

daniel_habib@fd.org
212-417-8742
Party name: Trevor Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543