Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8740
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8740
Title:Joseph Van Sach, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 1, 2018
Linked with 17A891
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1824)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2018Application (17A891) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 21 2018Application (17A891) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 27, 2018.
Apr 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 31, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2018.
Jul 02 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Stokeling v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2019).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William H Theis
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
55 E. Monroe St.
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60603

william_theis@fd.org
312.621.8300
Party name: Joseph Van Sach
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543