Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8739
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8739
Title:Maurice Dorvilus, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14417)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherProof of Service
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2018.
Jul 02 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Yvonne Foldes
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 East Broward Blvd.
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

margaret_foldes@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Maurice Dorvilus
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543