Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8678
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8678
Title:Anthony Grant Jackson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15100)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 29, 2018)
AppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetition
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2018.
Jun 28 2018Memorandum of respondent United Stated filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543