Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8676
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8676
Title:Ernest King, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11082)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 29, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2018.
Jun 28 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 24 2018Response Requested. (Due August 23, 2018)
Aug 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Sep 24 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Conrad Benjamin Kahn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Middle District of FL
201 South Orange Avenue, Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

conrad_kahn@fd.org
(407)-535-4415
Party name: Ernest King
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543