Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8663
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8663
Title:Anthony Steven Hall, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4479)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2018.
Jun 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 30, 2018.
Jul 30 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 30 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Anthony Steven Hall, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anne M. Laverty
    Counsel of Record
Mullin & Laverty, LC
1636 42nd St. NE
Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

alaverty@mullinlaverty.com
319-395-9191
Party name: Anthony Steven Hall, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543