Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8654
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8654
Title:Almighty Supreme Born Allah, Petitioner
v.
Lynn Milling, et al.
Docketed:April 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1443)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2018Waiver of right of respondents LYNN MILLING, et al. to respond filed.
May 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 11 2018Response Requested. (Due July 11, 2018)
Jun 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2018 to September 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust In Law Enforcement, and Promoting The Rule of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Law of Qualified Immunity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Joseph Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Barr & Morgan
84 West Park Pl
Stamford, CT 06901

jmorgan@pmpalawyer.com
203 356 1595
Party name: ALMIGHTY SUPREME BORN ALLAH
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven Matthew Barry
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Connecticut
110 Sherman Street.
Hartford, CT 06105

steven.barry@ct.gov
860-808-5450
Party name: LYNN MILLING, et al.
Other
Debo P. Adegbile
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-295-6717
Party name: Scholars of the Law of Qualified Immunity
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
202-216-1461
Party name: The Cato Institute
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5491
Party name: Gross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting The Rule of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543