Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8639
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8639
Title:Hernando Javier Vergara, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15059)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 29, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2018.
Jun 28 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 10 2018Reply of petitioner Hernando Javier Vergara filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adeel Mohammad Bashir
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender
400 N. Tampa Street, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

adeel_bashir@fd.org
703-835-3929
Party name: Hernando Javier Vergara
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543