Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8637
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8637
Title:Bobby Jo Gipson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5333)
   Decision Date:February 7, 2018
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2018.
Jun 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 25, 2018.
Jun 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 25 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 09 2018Reply of petitioner Bobby Jo Gipson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Bobby Jo Gipson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Letter from the Solicitor General dated September 12, 2018 received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Doris Randle-Holt
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
200 Jefferson Ave
Suite 200
Memphis, TN 38103

doris_holt@fd.org
901-544-3895
Party name: Bobby Jo Gipson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543