SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-8599 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-8599 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Lance Shockley, Petitioner
v.
Cindy Griffith, Warden
Docketed:
April 24, 2018
Linked with 17A863
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Missouri
Case Numbers:
(SC96694)
Decision Date:
November 21, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2018
Application (17A863) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2018 to April 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Other
Feb 14 2018
Application (17A863) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until April 20, 2018.
Apr 20 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 24, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 24 2018
Brief amici curiae of Retired Missouri Judges and Jurists filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 24 2018
Brief of respondent Cindy Griffith in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2018
Reply of petitioner Lance Shockley filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 14 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rosemary Ellen Percival
Counsel of Record
MO State Public Defender
920 Main Street
Suite 500
Kansas City, MO 64105
Rosemary.Percival@mspd.mo.gov
816-889-7699
Party name: Lance Shockley
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102
john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Cindy Griffith
Other
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19103
ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Retired Missouri Judges and Jurists
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##