Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-855
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-855
Title:Vance Norton, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, et al.
Docketed:December 14, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-4170)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 18, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondents The Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2018Reply of petitioners Vance Norton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jesse Carl Trentadue
    Counsel of Record
Suitter Axland, PLLC
8 East Broadway, Suite 200
Suite 200
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

jesse32@sautah.com
8015327300
Party name: Vance Norton, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@ndnlaw.com
303-673-9600
Party name: The Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543