Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8544
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8544
Title:Shannon D. Robinett, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3057)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Apr 24 2018Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Main Document
May 14 2018Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
May 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2018 to June 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 20, 2018.
Jun 20 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 21 2018Reply of petitioner Shannon D. Robinett filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
818 Grand, Ste. 300
Kansas City, MO 64106

dan_goldberg@fd.org
816-471-8282
Party name: Shannon D. Robinett
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543