Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8431
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8431
Title:Daniel Casamayor, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13616)
   Decision Date:January 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 10, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Apr 25 2018Response Requested. (Due May 25, 2018)
May 25 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard C. Klugh Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Ingraham Building
25 S.E. Second Ave., Suite 1100
Miami, FL 33131

rickklu@aol.com
3059036900
Party name: Daniel Casamayor
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543