Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8401
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8401
Title:Jimmy Lee Franklin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14495)
   Decision Date:January 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
May 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2018 to June 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 6, 2018.
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2018 to July 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2018.
Jul 06 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Nov 13 2018Reply of petitioner Jimmy Lee Franklin filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of the position asserted by the Solicitor General in his brief for the United States filed on July 6, 2018.
Mar 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
9546407102
Party name: Jimmy Lee Franklin
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543