Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8390
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8390
Title:Scott Allen Sperling, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-50342)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
May 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2018 to June 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 6, 2018.
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2018 to July 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2018.
Jul 06 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 14 2018Rescheduled.
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of United States v. Haymond, 588 U. S. ___ (2019).
Jul 30 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Guy Michael Tanaka
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Michael Tanaka
12400 Wilshire Blvd.
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90025

mike@mtanakalaw.com
3106178385
Party name: Scott Sperling
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543