Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8368
Title:Gregory Molette, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60253)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 4, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Apr 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2018 to June 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2018.
Jun 04 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Brown v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Scott
    Counsel of Record
200 S. Lamar St.
Ste. 200-N
Jackson, MS 39201

mike_scott@fd.org
601-948-4284
Party name: Gregory Molette
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543