Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8289
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8289
Title:Iramm Wright, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14568)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2018)
OtherMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixProof of ServicePetition
Apr 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2018 to May 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2018.
May 30 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ian McDonald
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

ian_mcdonald@fd.org
305-530-7000
Party name: Iramm Wright
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543