Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8272
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8272
Title:Jerome Bannister, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 28, 2018
Linked with 17A758
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10483)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2018Application (17A758) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2018 to March 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 18 2018Application (17A758) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 26, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOtherProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2018 to May 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2018.
May 29 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Chantel Doakes
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33065

chantel_doakes@fd.org
9546407131
Party name: Jerome Bannister
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543