Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8253 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8253 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Juan Edward Castillo, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-70,510-04)
   Decision Date:February 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2018Reply of petitioner Juan Castillo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jared P. TylerTexas Defender Service
1927 Blodgett Street
Houston, TX 77004

jptyler@texasdefender.org
(713) 222-7788
Party name: Juan Castillo
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Patrick Ballantyne Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bexar County Criminal District Attorney's Office
101 W. Nueva St., 7th Flr.
San Antonio, TX 78205

sballantyne@bexar.org
210-335-2418
Party name: Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543