Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8236 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8236 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Mark A. Twilegar, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Linked with 17A776
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-839)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2018Application (17A776) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2018 to March 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 25 2018Application (17A776) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 20, 2018.
Mar 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Apr 25 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
May 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Suzanne Myers Keffer
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - South
1 East Broward Blvd
Suite 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

keffers@ccsr.state.fl.us
9547131284
Party name: Mark Twilegar
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013

Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543