Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-820
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-820
Title:Santiago Alejandro Diaz-Esparza, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:December 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60004)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2018)
Dec 05 2017Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court’s Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system.
Jan 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2018 to February 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2018.
Feb 07 2018Memorandum of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General filed.
Feb 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raed Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Gonzalez Olivieri, LLC
2200 Southwest Freeway
Suite 550
Houston, TX 77098

rgonzalez@gonzalezolivierillc.com
(713) 481-3040
Party name: Santiago Alejandro Diaz-Esparza
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543