Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8160
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8160
Title:Michael J. Khoury, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2090)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2018 to May 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2018.
May 18 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Todd Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Southern District of Illinois
650 Missouri Ave
East St. Louis, IL 62201

todd_schultz@fd.org
618-482-9055
Party name: Michael Khoury
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543